J N FEAR'S INSTITUTE AND ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is based on the trust set up by the will of the late J. N. Fear to build a hall for the use of local people. The hall is used by local organisations who provide the running costs on the basis of usage. Community organisations are entitled to reduced rates and help in running the hall. The maintenance fund is invested in the C.O.I. fund and makes a small contribution to the running cost
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 22 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mary Veale | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Veale | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Henry Dyson | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN HENRY JAMES | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN NORMAN GAMBRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.08k | £48.52k | £33.56k | £43.49k | £50.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.51k | £29.59k | £43.46k | £40.55k | £60.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 25TH JUNE 1917.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A PARISH INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KEYNSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 WINDRUSH ROAD
KEYNSHAM
BRISTOL
BS31 1QN
- Phone:
- 01179864453
- Email:
- richard.dyson@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
fearhallkeynsham.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window