Financial history LONG LOAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.24k £10.42k £5.66k £7.38k £12.16k
Total expenditure £5.86k £1.49k £3.67k £15.33k £14.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £8.47k