LYDEARD ST LAWRENCE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of village hall facilities for use by local community groups and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 December 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michaela Greener | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Welch | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Daisy Jane Williams | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Glendinning | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Marshall | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Campbell | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND PAUL YEOMANS | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anna Junkinson-Broad | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.94k | £5.15k | £8.01k | £6.51k | £7.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £4.16k | £3.37k | £7.46k | £5.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1963 AND AN ORDER DATED 16 MAY 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LYDEARD ST LAWRENCE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL , RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Church Close
Lydeard St. Lawrence
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA4 3SF
- Phone:
- 01984667368
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window