Financial history MIDSOMER NORTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 304582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.00k £0 £13.65k £5.93k £4.05k
Total expenditure £6.07k £72 £17.80k £10.75k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A