Financial history THE MONKTON COMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.92k £20.69k £29.74k £11.02k £23.71k
Total expenditure £6.80k £17.69k £9.47k £5.75k £40.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £17.23k N/A N/A