MOORLAND AND FORDGATE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains a hall serving the communities of Moorland and Fordgate. Lets the hall for activities such as a weekly pilates group, badminton group, Zumba sessions, coffee morning, exercise class, monthly womens group, fortnightly art group, plus annual produce show and other community events. Private lets to community members for family events & parties. Local fundraising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 April 1963: Standard registration
- MOORLAND AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Genna Rossitter | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Davis | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DONNA HOWLETT | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Small | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Gray | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Robertson | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Vize Chair | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Betty Field | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Doyle | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rossitter | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Dodd | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42k | £14.21k | £20.09k | £13.90k | £6.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.39k | £7.72k | £6.52k | £10.00k | £11.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.77k | £4.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 04.03.1953 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 08.06.1981
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VILLAGERS OF MOORLAND AND FORDGATE.
Area of benefit
VILLAGES OF MOORLAND AND FORDGATE AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westside
Moorland
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA7 0AX
- Phone:
- 07793014919
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window