MIZZYMEAD RECREATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sections for: Indoor and Outdoor Bowling, All weather Tennis. Bridge, Snooker and Pool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £211 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
Governance
- 25 May 1968: Standard registration
- NAILSEA PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION (MIZZYMEAD FARM) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Curry | Chair | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Michelle Hodson Nelson | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Colin Harris | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Margaret Alice Whitaker | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Faulkner | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janine Gwynne Clarke | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Philip Waller | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ken John Bawdon | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR RAY WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.14k | £98.63k | £133.95k | £178.69k | £193.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.02k | £113.51k | £87.34k | £147.54k | £176.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £211 | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £27.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 1 JUNE 1965
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NAILSEA AND THE NEIGHBOROUGHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mizzymead Recreation Centre
Mizzymead Rise
Nailsea
BRISTOL
BS48 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01275 854181
- Email:
- mizzymead@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
mizzymead.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window