NORTH CURRY PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and enhance the pavilion and playing field of the Parish of North Curry for the benefit of the inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 September 1971: Standard registration
- NORTH CURRY PLAYING FIELDS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Vaughan | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ashley Brown | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Oldfield | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
TONY TURNER | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.95k | £24.72k | £11.53k | £31.99k | £10.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.58k | £10.15k | £10.75k | £18.86k | £32.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.07k | £21.53k | £9.25k | £23.68k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 24TH OF JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELD
Area of benefit
NORTH CURRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Lockyers Field
North Curry
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA3 6FB
- Phone:
- 07769158784
- Email:
- pavilion@northcurry.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window