OARE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304601
Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Village Hall was sold in Feb 2010. In accordance with the terms of the original bequest the proceeds of sale are now held by the Trustees to be used for charitable purpoises to benefit the inhabitants of the parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew George Halliday Chair 29 August 2014
None on record
Jeremy James Syvret Payne Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
BRIAN JOHN WOOLLACOTT Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY JOHN RICHARDS Trustee
None on record
HERBERT HENRY RICHARDS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 March 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MESSRS BEN HALLIDAY
Ashton Farm
Countisbury
LYNTON
EX35 6BL
Phone:
01598741232
Website:

No information available