VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and run Queen Camel Memorial Hall for the good of residents of Queen Camel in general and for the use of youth groups and the elderly in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 May 1964: Standard registration
- QUEEN CAMEL MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Richmond-Scott | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kit Stapely | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Swetenham | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Naylor | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Scully | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Millard | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gettings | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Angus Davidson | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Liz Jardine | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Corbett | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JILL GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA SWEBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.23k | £1.01k | £6.32k | £10.07k | £12.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.24k | £9.83k | £11.11k | £8.74k | £12.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28TH APRIL 1964
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
QUEEN CAMEL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAGSTONE COTTAGE
HIGH STREET
QUEEN CAMEL
YEOVIL
SOMERSET
BA22 7NE
- Phone:
- 01935851747
- Email:
- john.corbett@memcor.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window