Financial history THE LADY SMITH MEMORIAL

Charity number: 304629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.94k £25.78k £11.68k £12.22k £11.21k
Total expenditure £15.31k £9.07k £11.99k £16.67k £15.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.36k £3.92k N/A N/A