VILLAGE HALL STAWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for local groups such as Short Mat Bowling, keep fit,yoga,Take Art and other functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £2,750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maxine Hughes | Chair | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diana Jane Forrester-Brown | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Thexton | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Turner | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hughes | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.97k | £17.63k | £21.13k | £21.83k | £18.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.43k | £7.19k | £26.01k | £24.66k | £18.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.81k | £10.00k | £18.71k | £200 | £2.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 JAN 1988
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STAWELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STAWELL AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Manor Court
Stawell
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA7 9RY
- Phone:
- 01278723665
- Email:
- Maxine.hughes2@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window