TRIDENT YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trident Youth and Community Centre provides facilities for use by the local community-Galmington, Comeytrowe and Bishops Hull. The Centre comprises a hall, stage, kitchen, storage areas and toilet facilities. The Centre has an outdoor playing area suitable for five-a-side football and netball with additional toilet and changing facilities. There is also a Youth Club hut and a Day Nursery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 September 1967: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1172028 TRIDENT YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
- THE TRIDENT (Working name)
- GALMINGTON AND BISHOPS HULL YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.60k | £45.38k | £45.55k | £40.07k | £44.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.01k | £38.67k | £34.36k | £26.81k | £46.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £250 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.65k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 24 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 15 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 15 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 02 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
13 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 11TH FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF CHILDREN AND PERSONS, IN THE BOROUGH OF TAUNTON DEANE
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF TAUNTON DEANE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window