THE CONYGRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of large Village Hall and Recreation Field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 20 December 1971: Standard registration
- TIMSBURY VILLAGE HALL TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Perryman | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lewis | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Boxall | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Anne Ansell | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Warrener | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Kendall | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Cooper Bradley | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Carroll | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND ARTHUR MERCHANT | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN HANCOCK | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET MERCHANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.54k | £43.34k | £47.22k | £47.41k | £69.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.32k | £34.87k | £38.89k | £75.65k | £98.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.57k | £10.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1971, SCHEME DATED 12/05/2005
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
TIMSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THREE CHIMNEYS
AMESBURY
TIMSBURY
BATH
BA2 0HF
- Phone:
- 01761479661
- Email:
- davidhcollett@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window