Accounts and annual returns RECREATION GROUND CHARITY (1937)
Charity number: 304691
Charity reporting is overdue by 1709 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 613 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 613 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 978 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 978 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1343 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1709 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1709 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window