CARLTON COLVILLE COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AS THE HUB OF THE VILLAGE, THE COMMUNITY CENTRE PROVIDES A PLACE FOR VARIOUS CLUB ACTIVITIES TO BE CONDUCTED, BENEFITING AN AGE RANGE FROM THE VERY YOUNG TO SENIOR CITIZENS. THE COMMUNITY CENTRE HAS ALSO BEEN DELEGATED AS A " PLACE OF SAFETY" IN THE EVENT OF FLOODS OR OTHER EMERGENCIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 May 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Williams | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachael Elizabeth Arnott | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Clare Varela | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Keri Louise Clements | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH MARCH 1969
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS, COMMUNITY CENTRES AND OTHER AMENITIES OF A SIMILAR CHARACTER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN CARLTON COLVILLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEEMED IN LAW TO BE CHARITABLE BY IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CARLTON COLVILLE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carlton Colville Community Centre
Hall Road
Carlton Colville
LOWESTOFT
NR33 8BT
- Phone:
- 01502585608
- Email:
- cccchallbookings@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window