Trustees COPDOCK AND WASHBROOK VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304731

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Elizabeth Watson | Chair | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Watling | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Taylor | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Jane Fisher | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Tyrrell Mrs | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Sheppard Mrs | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Howes Mr | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRED GREEN | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.