Trustees BEALINGS VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 304752

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER PRENTICE | Chair | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blanche Prentice | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Trevor Julian Stephen Harris | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Margery Saagi | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN HAYWOOD SMITH | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HONOR WILSON | Trustee | 23 September 2001 |
|
|
||||
Keith Beaumont | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.