Trustees HACHESTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304756

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Giesen | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Roy Barney | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm George Robinson | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hurlock | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Green | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jennings | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ZOE POTTER | Trustee | 06 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HURLOCK | Trustee | 11 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.