HAUGHLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE SCHOOL DISCO DANCING W.I. HAUGHLEY HOOFERS (CLOG DANCING) TAI CHI AMATUER DRAMATICS FILM NIGHTS COMMUNITY CAFE ARTS & CRAFTS GROUP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Williams | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Mahon | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNN ALLUM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.25k | £42.55k | £32.54k | £35.39k | £20.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.75k | £39.22k | £38.36k | £52.21k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £36.53k | £18.54k | £16.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24/03/1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAUGHLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
HAUGHLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 West View
STOWMARKET
IP14 1SD
- Phone:
- 07837953266
- Email:
- lynnallum@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window