Accounts and annual returns HEMINGSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 November 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2024 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2023 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2022 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2021 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required