LINSTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The village hall is run for the benefit of the residents of Linstead Parva and Linstead Magna. It is used for various social events throughout the year and for parish meetings. It is also used a a Polling Station when required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET HEATH | Chair | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
clive adrian frost | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JAMES KEABLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA JEAN FROST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROGER HOLLINS WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE DORTHEA KEABLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA DENISE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH CLIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNA BRAMBLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY DAVID LEICESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH MARY FENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTORIA ROSE WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £173 | £722 | £5.56k | £1.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.73k | £765 | £882 | £5.47k | £2.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 21ST APRIL 1959
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
LINSTEAD MAGNA AND LINSTEAD PARVA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARDWELL COTTAGE
LINSTEAD
HALESWORTH
IP19 0LQ
- Phone:
- 01986785167
- Email:
- wilkinsonvr@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window