MARLESFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Marlesford Village Hall aims to provide a location for social gatherings, parish council meetings, clubs and similar activities, relevant to the population of Marlesford. When funds become available, grants will be made to young persons in the parish to help further their studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 June 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Lewis Cox | Chair | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McCauley-Page | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pip Headlam | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £745 | £760 | £795 | £822 | £829 | |
|
Total expenditure | £240 | £0 | £481 | £700 | £675 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 27TH JANUARY 1954
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MARLESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MILL LANE
MARLESFORD
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01728747038
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window