Financial history METFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.39k £10.47k £5.24k £7.97k £11.89k
Total expenditure £12.94k £7.45k £13.50k £11.70k £11.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A