RINGSFIELD AND WESTON RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration and upkeep of Village Facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- RINGSFIELD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Edward Fletcher | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH STATT | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SCOTT | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN WARNER | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Louise Botham | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.32k | £25.86k | £19.27k | £10.54k | £14.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.46k | £10.89k | £13.91k | £22.84k | £9.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.71k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 12 MAY 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF RINGSFIELD AND WESTON FOR RECREATION OR SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
RINGSFIELD AND WESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Cottage
Ringsfield
BECCLES
Suffolk
NR34 8JU
- Phone:
- 01502713497
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window