Financial history SOUTH ELMHAM ST MARGARET VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.69k £11.33k £10.28k £4.52k £6.25k
Total expenditure £4.74k £2.37k £8.78k £6.14k £4.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A