Accounts and annual returns STUTTON COMMUNITY HALL

Charity Number: 304825
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required