STUTTON COMMUNITY HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for social and sporting activities, committee meetings and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 July 1965: Standard registration
- 30 April 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 April 2021: Funds transferred to 1188188 STUTTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.75k | £11.63k | £12.15k | £12.15k | £18.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.90k | £10.67k | £12.82k | £12.82k | £9.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £500 | £500 | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 09 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 07 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 19TH JANUARY 1965
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STUTTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window