TUDDENHAM ST MARTIN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The upkeep and management of Tuddenham St Martin Village Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £220 from 1 government contract(s) and £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 June 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN BLOOMFIELD | Chair | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Colin Williamson | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL JENNINGS | Trustee | 04 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
IAN WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.86k | £16.08k | £13.48k | £6.49k | £10.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.80k | £4.48k | £4.77k | £4.51k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £220 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.30k | £11.21k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPININONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH OBJCECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CONVEYANCE DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1964
Contact information
- Address:
-
TIMBERS
FYNN LANE
TUDDENHAM
IPSWICH
IP6 9DB
- Phone:
- 01473785256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window