Trustees WALDRINGFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 304830

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Hall | Chair | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Sims | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Shore | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Nayler | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Kay Forsdike | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marian Joan Bradley | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joy Wood | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Graham King | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
TONY LYON | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.