Accounts and annual returns WICKHAM MARKET PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304837
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 05 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 27 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 12 September 2015 | 44 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 20 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window