BARNINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space to enable activities and meeting space for residents of the village or neigbouring villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 07 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Weaver | Chair | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Chalmers | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Patricia Abersteen | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Kathryn Chalmers | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Surridge | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Michael Stuart Millett | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Sams | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS J MORTIBOY | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.14k | £22.05k | £11.54k | £5.96k | £6.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £3.72k | £17.15k | £6.19k | £10.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.34k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
BARNINGHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Millfield Road
Barningham
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 1DY
- Phone:
- 01359220014
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window