Financial history BARTON MILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £18.11k £20.98k £10.85k £11.32k £10.85k
Total expenditure £8.79k £10.15k £10.47k £16.31k £15.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.71k N/A N/A N/A