BARTON MILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a Village Hall for the inhabitants of the Parish of Barton Mills and the neighbourhood, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 March 1965: Standard registration
- BARTON MILLS VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Colasante | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gibson | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janette Miller | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith Fuller | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Anderson | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dave Traher | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ASHTON | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE STIRGES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NANCY MARY LOUISE HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAITH RUTTERFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.11k | £20.98k | £10.85k | £11.32k | £10.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £10.15k | £10.47k | £16.31k | £15.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7TH MAY 1963
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BARTON MILLS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Church Meadow
Barton Mills
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP28 6AR
- Phone:
- 01638515215
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window