FELSHAM AND GEDDING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintainance of Community Village Hall to enable use for the purposes of 'pyhsical and mental training and recreation and social moral and intellectual development through the medium of reading and recreation rooms libraries lectures classes recreations and entertainments or otherwise as may be found expedient for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parishes of Felsham and Gedding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £979 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 October 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David Conquest Mr | Chair | 16 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard A Vaas | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
REV Sharon Potter | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.95k | £23.80k | £17.67k | £24.36k | £17.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.75k | £7.79k | £14.57k | £14.14k | £11.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.71k | £10.67k | £1.00k | £979 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24 APRIL 1948
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF FELSHAM AND GEDDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Felsham and Gedding Village Hall
Church Road
Felsham
Bury St Edmunds
IP30 0PQ
- Phone:
- 01449 737619
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window