GAZELEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support the activities of the organisations which use the village hall & to look after & maintain the hall to a high standard.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £5,886
Total expenditure: £8,726

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORI ANNE SCHARF Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
JANE LEWIS Trustee
None on record
PATRICK JAMES MCCALMONT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £9.39k £20.25k £12.76k £4.77k £5.89k
Total expenditure £6.01k £4.34k £5.94k £8.12k £8.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.81k £10.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 HIGHWOOD ROAD
GAZELEY
NEWMARKET
CB8 8RJ
Phone:
01638552848
Website:

No information available