GREAT BARTON THANKSGIVING FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARTS, CULTURE, SPORTS & RECREATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 September 1964: Standard registration
- GREAT BARTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER FREDERICK FISK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Diana Sian Bilverstone | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie King | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Caulder Morgan | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Ayling | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Ann Campbell | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Dunn | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET REDSHAW | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM TEE | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
William George Worsley CHARNAUD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.08k | £25.69k | £20.95k | £28.47k | £30.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.86k | £23.02k | £28.29k | £31.06k | £30.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.71k | £2.67k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1948
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREAT BARTON AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
ELMS CLOSE
GREAT BARTON
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 2NR
- Phone:
- 07384 614 522
- Email:
- wcharnaud@AOL.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window