Financial history GREAT AND LITTLE THURLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.30k £22.80k £17.73k £10.43k £7.79k
Total expenditure £8.47k £2.22k £7.81k £9.37k £8.71k
Income from government contracts £550 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £10.67k N/A N/A