GREAT AND LITTLE THURLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall available for rental to sundry organisations or individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 March 1965: Standard registration
- THURLOW VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Arthur Loveday | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sherry Collier | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Griffiths | Trustee | 11 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patient | Trustee | 11 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.30k | £22.80k | £17.73k | £10.43k | £7.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £2.22k | £7.81k | £9.37k | £8.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £550 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.71k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JULY 1959
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GREAT AND LITTLE THURLOW AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farthing House
Pound Green
Thurlow
Haverhill
CB9 7HY
- Phone:
- 01440783693
- Email:
- THURLOWVH@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window