Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.69k £24.32k £14.78k £7.33k £5.64k
Total expenditure £11.24k £3.85k £34.63k £7.37k £6.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.57k £8.00k N/A N/A