KEDINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Kedington and the Neighbourhood by associating with the local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for the recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 May 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Derek Jeffrey Raine | Chair | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Anthony William Farr | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brown | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Davis | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.48k | £35.84k | £37.87k | £66.24k | £67.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.91k | £35.08k | £39.42k | £65.95k | £60.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.11k | £11.33k | £16.55k | £4.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 11TH JULY 1968
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF KEDINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
KEDINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 RISBRIDGE DRIVE
KEDINGTON
HAVERHILL
SUFFOLK
CB9 7ZD
- Phone:
- 01440704105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window