Financial history LAWSHALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.67k £18.88k £21.13k £25.63k £21.76k
Total expenditure £11.55k £19.33k £27.61k £28.83k £22.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.33k £9.37k £3.21k N/A £0