THE NAYLAND-WITH-WISSINGTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recreational facilities, playing fields/grounds, community centres etc for the benefit of the local community with the object of advancing education/health, relieving poverty/distress/sickness or in pursuing any charitable objects towards improving the condition of life of the persons for whom the facilities are primarily intended To raise funds for furtherance of these objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 October 1967: Standard registration
- NAYLAND COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL HITCHCOCK | Chair | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert Cable | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Metson | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ellen Ryan | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Tara Clark | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE BULLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRYAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORRAINE BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Victoria Sargent | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.52k | £4.82k | £15.71k | £16.47k | £15.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.99k | £5.55k | £9.51k | £23.65k | £13.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS AND COMMUNITY CENTRES WITHIN THE BENEFICIAL AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NAYLAND-WITH-WISSINGTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 STOKE ROAD
NAYLAND
COLCHESTER
CO6 4JD
- Phone:
- 01206263169
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window