NAYLAND WITH WISSINGTON RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304928
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Charity shall be the provision and maintenance of a village hall and a recreation ground for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Nayalnd with Wissington and the neighbourhood thereof including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £46,267
Total expenditure: £32,846

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NAYLAND VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAIN WRIGHT Chair
THE NAYLAND-WITH-WISSINGTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL
Received: On time
Karen Margret Freeman Trustee 05 March 2025
None on record
CHRISTINE THOMPSON Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
NICHOLAS MORIARTY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.92k £17.02k £22.52k £26.53k £46.27k
Total expenditure £20.75k £17.61k £19.50k £27.06k £32.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £12.19k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 January 2025 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Nayland Village Hall
Church Lane
Nayland
CO6 4JH
Phone:
01206 263646
Email:
No information available