NEWTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management of Newton Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of Newton and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions and in particular for use for meetings, lecture and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 May 1971: Standard registration
- NEWTON GREEN VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Graham Ferguson | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Parry | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Presland | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|||||
JOAN LINNEY | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
FIONA GARMAN | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ARTHUR JAMES VINCE | Trustee | 01 January 1980 |
|
|
||||
RITA CAROLYN SCHWENK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET WEAVERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.74k | £10.13k | £14.70k | £10.67k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.08k | £6.22k | £11.54k | £27.78k | £12.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/03/1965 AS AMENDED ON 13/12/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS...WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARN COTTAGE
CHURCH ROAD
NEWTON
SUDBURY
CO10 0QP
- Phone:
- 01787373963
- Email:
- janetweavers@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window