ASHTEAD PEACE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Three rooms plus kitchen, servery, stage; and bar, providing facilities for: Meetings; Dinners; Dancing; Theatre; Exhibitions; etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £36,304 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE HILEY | Chair | 19 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Score | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Jane Agnes Maria McArthur | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Mary Porter | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Joseph Arch | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Charles Sevenoaks | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Beck | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachel Pearson | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Henry George Harwood | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Eileen Ventham-Smith | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Sylvia Reynolds | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Williams | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ANN LAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE STIRLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY CANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.70k | £74.81k | £91.29k | £104.80k | £161.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.81k | £85.80k | £106.32k | £85.05k | £121.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.66k | £29.65k | £6.51k | N/A | £36.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JULY 1926. SCHEME DATED 7 JUNE 1962 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASHTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHTEAD PEACE MEMORIAL HALL
WOODFIELD LANE
ASHTEAD
KT21 2BE
- Phone:
- 01372272921
- Email:
- enquiries@apmh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window