Trustees BISLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304978

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Lewis Davey | Chair | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Corner | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Ince | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Russell Hayes | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Miles | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mary Timpson | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Sidney Colvin | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Rothwell | Trustee | 15 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.