BUSBRIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall providing building facilities for use by the local community for recreational or educational purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 September 1961: Standard registration
- 16 May 2018: Funds received from 239223 BUSBRIDGE WORKING MEN'S INSTITUTE FUND
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Hamish Robertson | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN STURNEY | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Macholl | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Christine Heagin | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN AUSTIN BETTS | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £18.82k | £24.32k | £21.00k | £29.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.97k | £16.75k | £16.64k | £16.47k | £18.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 February 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 JULY 1948
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
BUSBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Busbridge Village Hall
Brighton Road
GODALMING
Surrey
GU7 1XA
- Phone:
- 01483422510
- Email:
- busbridgebookings@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window