WOLDINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide a venue for a full range of village and local / leisure activities including but not limited to; badminton, zumba, , stage plays, annual pantomime, horticultural events, parish council meetings, nursery school, dance class, wedding receptions and parties for all ages etc. We also act as the Polling Station for Local and National elections.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £68,099
Total expenditure: £64,147

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Sean Lewis Chair 09 April 2018
None on record
Edward James Cooke Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
Nancy Collard Trustee 22 May 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PAUL WITH ST. AGATHA, WOLDINGHAM
Received: On time
Nicola Howe Trustee 09 April 2018
None on record
NICOLA JANE FRASER Trustee 19 October 2012
RAPE CRISIS SURREY AND SUSSEX
ANDREW RICHARD KOZMINSKI Trustee 14 October 2011
None on record
MS CARO ROWLEY Trustee
OXTED AND LIMPSFIELD BARN THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £65.14k £52.36k £56.76k £65.82k £68.10k
Total expenditure £74.81k £41.87k £34.48k £52.25k £64.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.58k £11.33k £14.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woldingham Village Hall
Station Road
Woldingham
CATERHAM
Surrey
CR3 7DA
Phone:
01883652597