THE CHOBHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of buildings and facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 June 1965: Standard registration
- CHOBHAM VILLAGE HALL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN AUBURN COWING TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carole Lisbeth Mancini | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Massarano | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Len Brum | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Gillham | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Gwynne Beavis | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM MUMFORD | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ROGER LEADSOM | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
GORDON JOHN PARRIS | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID MARTIN PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTONY PETER ALLUM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.55k | £20.75k | £26.35k | £23.23k | £25.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.15k | £13.63k | £13.28k | £18.36k | £36.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.80k | £16.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 24 JUNE 1965, ORDER 3 MAY 2006 AND MEMORANDUM ADOPTED 14 MAY 2007. as amended on 08 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
SHALL BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHOBHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND, IN PARTICULAR, FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHOBHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Station Road
Chobham
WOKING
Surrey
GU24 8AQ
- Phone:
- 0000000000000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window